Hays v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jeffrey W. Hayes, Sr.
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2013cv00247
Filed: July 31, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: CLARK
Presiding Judge: Michael J Newman
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 32 -The Amended Report and Recommendation (Doc. 32) filed on February 2,2017 is ADOPTED in full, Plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees under the Social Security Act 25 is GRANTED, Plaintiff's counsel is AWARDED $18,401.00 in attorney's fees; and the the case remains TERMINATED on the docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 2-21-2017. (de)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER VACATING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DATED JANUARY 5, 2017 (DOC. 31 ) AND AMENDING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION1 THAT (1) PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES UNDER SOCIAL SECURITY ACT (DOC. 25 ) BE GRANTED; (2) PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL BE AWARDED THE REQUESTED SUM OF $18,401.00 IN ATTORNEYS FEES; (3) PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IS ORDERED TO REIMBURSE PLAINTIFF, WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS, THE $6,000.00 EAJA FEE PREVIOUSLY AWARDED TO COUNSEL; AND (4) THIS CASE REMAIN TERMINATED ON THE COURTS DOCKET. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 2/2/17. (kma)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION1 THAT (1) PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES (DOC. 25 ) BE GRANTED; (2) PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL BE AWARDED $18,401.00 IN ATTORNEYS FEES; AND (3) THIS CASE REMAIN TERMINATED ON THE COURTS DOCKET. Objections to R&R due by 1/19/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 1/5/17. (kma)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS -It is ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation filed on February 2, 2015 23 is ADOPTED in full, Plaintiff's unopposed motion for an EAJA fee award 22 is GRANTED, Plaintiff is AWARDED $6,000 in EAJA fees and $400 in costs, and the case remains TERMINATED on the docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 3-2-2015. (de)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 22 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant To The Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Jeffrey W. Hayes, Sr. Objections to R&R due by 2/20/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J Newman on 2/2/2015. (ead1)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CLERK'S JUDGMENT WITH NOTICE OF DISPOSAL ATTACHED. Signed on 9/25/14. (ep)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION THAT: 1. The Commissioner's non-disability finding be found unsupported by substantial evidence, and REVERSED; 2. The Commissioner's motion for remand (doc. 13 ) be GRANTED as set forth in this Report and Recommen dation; 3. This matter be REMANDED to the Commissioner under the Fourth Sentence of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) for proceedings consistent with this opinion; and 4. This case be CLOSED. Objections to R&R due by 8/25/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J Newman on 8/6/14. (cib1)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: The parties are ORDERED to comply with all provisions set forth in Sixth Amended Magistrate Judges General Order No. 11 (effective September 1, 2011). The General Order is attached hereto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 10/24/2013. (ea)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hays v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey W. Hayes, Sr.
Represented By: Carla J Lauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?