Winkle v. Loranger et al
Plaintiff: Mark R Winkle
Defendant: Carol S Loranger, Barry Milligan, Alpana Sharma, Crystal Lake, Michael Griest, Amy Barnhart, Chris Hall, Amy Johnson, Jason Champagne, Sol Solomon, College of Liberal Arts of Wright State University, Financial Aid Department of Wright State University, Wright State University, Colleen Finegan, John Haught, Chris Murphy, David R. Hopkins, Mary Jane Walling, Autumn Cobb-Coleman, Office of the Registrar of Wright State University, College of Education and Human Services of Wright State University, Ohio Board of Regents University System of Ohio, Ame Duncan and United States Department of Education
Case Number: 3:2014cv00020
Filed: January 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: CLARK
Presiding Judge: Michael R Merz
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 45 -The Court hereby certifies to the United States Court of Appeals that Plaintiffs appeal (USCA Case No. 14-3758) is not taken in good faith and he should not be permitted to proceedin forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 8-19-2014. (de)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING APPEAL IN FORMA PAUPERIS - Accordingly, it is respectfully recommended that this Court certify to the Sixth Circuit that this appeal is not taken in good faith and should not be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 8/18/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 08/01/14. (pb1)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ENTRY AND ORDER OVERRULING WINKLE'S OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE MERZ'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING SANCTIONS (Doc. 42 ); ADOPTING MAGISTRATE MERZ'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING SANCTIONS (Doc. 41 ) IN PART; ASSESSING A MONETARY PENALTY AGAINST WINKLE IN THE AMOUNT OF $500; BARRING WINKLE FROM FILING ANY NEW CASES IN THIS COURT IN FORMA PAUPERIS UNTIL HE COMPLIES WITH THIS ORDER AND DENYING WINKLE'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY (Doc. 32 ) - Winkle is hereby asse ssed a monetary penalty of $500. Further, until Winkle complies with this sanctions Order, he is barred from filing new cases in this Court in forma pauperis. As for Winkles Motion To Disqualify (Doc. 32 ), the Magistrate Judge recommends ordering Winkle to withdraw said Motion. However, the Court finds said motion to be without merit and, therefore, denies same. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 7/7/14. (ep)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ON SANCTIONS - The Magistrate Judge believes an appropriate sanction in this case is an order to Plaintiff to withdraw the offending motion and a monetary penalty of $500. Until Plaintiff complies with the sanctions order, he should be barred from filing new cases in this Court in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 7/14/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 6/25/2014. (kpf1)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CLERK'S JUDGMENT WITH NOTICE OF DISPOSAL ATTACHED. Signed on 6/20/14. (ep)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ENTRY AND ORDER OVERRULING WINKLE'S OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE MERZ'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (Doc. 17 ); OVERRULING WINKLE'S OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE MERZ'S SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (Doc. 24 ); OVERRULING WINKLE&# 039;S OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE MERZ'S SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (Doc. 28 ); ADOPTING MAGISTRATE MERZ'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (Doc. 14 ), SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (Doc. 22 ) AND SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (Doc. 26 ) IN THEIR ENTIRETY; GRANTING THE "STATE OF OHIO DEFENDANTS'" MOTION TO DISMISS (Doc. 7 ) AND DISMISSING WINKLE'S AMENDED COMPLAINT (Doc. 3 ) AGAINST THE "STATE OF OHIO DEFENDANTS" WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 6/17/14. (ep)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 DECISION AND ORDER DENYING SECOND MOTION FOR RECUSAL AND DENYING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 32 . By signing the Motion 32 , Plaintiff has certified that the three allegations made in the motion have evidentiary support. Plaint iff is ORDERED to produce any evidentiary support he has access to that support these three factual allegations in conjunction with his response to this Order to Show Cause why he should not be sanctioned under Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 for making in the Motion 32 the three allegations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 6/7/2014. (gh1)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 DECISION AND ORDER DENYING DEMAND FOR RECUSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 5/28/2014. (kpf1)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO ADD AND DELETE PARTIES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 5/16/2014. (kpf1)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RECOMMITTAL ORDER re 24 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Mark R Winkle. This matter is hereby returned to the Magistrate Judge with instructions to file a supplemental report. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 5/14/14. (ep)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - It is again respectfully recommended that the Complaint herein be dismissed without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction as to those claims barred by the Eleventh Amendment and for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted as to the remaining claims. Objections to R&R due by 5/27/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 5/9/2014. (kpf1)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RECOMMITTAL ORDER - The District Judge has preliminarily considered the Objections and believes they will be more appropriately resolved after further analysis by the Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b)(3), this matter is hereby returned to the Magistrate Judge with instructions to file a supplemental report analyzing the Objections and making recommendations based on that analysis. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 5-7-2014. (de)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING EXTENSION OF TIME; REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - The Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply (Doc. #13) is DENIED. It is respectfully recommended that the State of Ohio Defendants' Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 5/5/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 4/17/2014. (kpf1)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - As to any Defendants upon which service has not been perfected by May 21, 2014, the Magistrate Judge will recommend dismissal for want of prosecution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 4/7/2014. (kpf1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winkle v. Loranger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark R Winkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol S Loranger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpana Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Griest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Barnhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Champagne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sol Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: College of Liberal Arts of Wright State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Aid Department of Wright State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen Finegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Haught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David R. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Jane Walling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autumn Cobb-Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Registrar of Wright State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: College of Education and Human Services of Wright State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Board of Regents University System of Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ame Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?