Moss v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Shenequa Moss
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2014cv00383
Filed: November 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Ovington
Presiding Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 DECISION AND ENTRY - It is therefore ORDERED that: 1. The Amended Report and Recommendations docketed on April 20, 2017(Doc. # 27 ) is ADOPTED in full ; 2. Plaintiffs Motion For Attorney Fees Under the Equal Justice Act, 28 U. S.C. §2412( d) (Doc. # 23 ) is granted, in part, and denied, in part; 3. The Commissioner is ordered to pay Plaintiffs attorney fees in the total amount of $6,678.63; and 4. The case is terminated on the docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 5/5/2017. (srb)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - IT IS THEREFORE RECOMMENDED THAT: 1. Plaintiff's Motion For Attorney Fees Under the Equal Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d) (Doc. # 23 ) be granted, in part, and denied, in part; 2. The Commissioner be ordered to pay Plaintiffs attorney fees in the total amount of $6,678.63; and 3. The case remain terminated on the docket of this Court Objections to R&R due by 5/4/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 4/19/2017. (srb)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - IT IS THEREFORE RECOMMENDED THAT: 1. Plaintiff's Motion For Attorney Fees Under the Equal Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d) (Doc. # 23 ) be granted, in part, and denied, in part; 2. The Commissioner be ordered to pay Plaintiffs attorney fees in the total amount of $6,098.28; and 3. The case remain terminated on the docket of this Court. Objections to R&R due by 4/25/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 4/11/2017. (srb)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: (1) The Commissioner's non-disability finding be affirmed; and (2) The case be terminated on the docket of this Court. Objections to R&R due by 2/22/2016. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 2/3/16. (mcm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moss v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shenequa Moss
Represented By: Steven Barry Horenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?