Roe v. Amazon.com et al
Plaintiff: John and Jane Roe
Defendant: Amazon.com, Barnes & Noble Inc, Apple Inc and Jane Doe
Case Number: 3:2015cv00111
Filed: March 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MIAMI
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 RECUSAL ORDER. Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 3/9/2018. (srb)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ENTRY AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT 61 AND ORDERING CLERK TO ENTER JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF AMAZON.COM, INC., BARNES & NOBLE, INC., AND SMASHWORDS, INC. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 7-27-2016. (de)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ENTRY AND ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT JANE DOE'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS, DOC. 45 , AND GRANTING ALL OTHER DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. DOCS. 23 , 24 , 32 , 37 , AND 42 . The Clerk is ORDERED to enter summary judgment in favor of Defendants Amazon.com, Barnes & Noble, and Smashwords, Inc. on all claims against them. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 3/15/16. (ep)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roe v. Amazon.com et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John and Jane Roe
Represented By: David Eugene Beitzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com
Represented By: John F Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes & Noble Inc
Represented By: Aneca E Lasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: Bruce P Keller
Represented By: Daniel Perry Mead
Represented By: James J Pastore
Represented By: John Wolcott Zeiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?