Hersko v. James, et al
Plaintiff: Bart S Hersko
Defendant: Deborah Lee James and John Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 3:2015cv00215
Filed: June 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Rose
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:794
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting 59 Motion for Summary Judgment and finding as moot 80 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 7-18-2018. (de)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ENTRY AND ORDER granting 60 Motion for Additional Time To Conduct Discovery and granting 61 Motion to Compel the Oral Deposition of Stephen Sayeedi -Plaintiff shall be permitted until November 21, 2017 to conduct the deposition of Mr. Sayeedi. Plaintiff may depose Mr. Sayeedi for no longer than 1 day of 7 hours, as permitted under Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(d)(1). In order to accommodate Mr. Sayeedi's medical condition, if Mr. Sayeedi so requests, the parties shall conduct Mr. Sayeedi's deposition over the course of two days, the total duration of which still shall not exceed 7 hours. No other discovery is permitted. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due December 5, 2017. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 10-26-2017. (de)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER - The discovery phase of this case has ended. No discovery motion or other matter referred to the undersigned Judicial Officer remains pending. The Clerk of Courts is directed to note in the record that: (1) referral of this case to the undersigned Judicial Officer has expired; and (2) no motion or other matter in this case remains pending before the undersigned Judicial Officer. IT IS SO ORDERED.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 9/27/17. (kma)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hersko v. James, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bart S Hersko
Represented By: Alissa Sammarco Magenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Lee James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?