Moon v. Fischer et al
Plaintiff: Darnell Wesly Moon
Defendant: Sheriff Fischer, Officer Metz, Beth Prall, Frank Hill and Officer Bradley
Case Number: 3:2015cv00274
Filed: August 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: BUTLER
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Rose
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER AND ENTRY DISMISSING THIS CASE WITH PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 1/16/2019. (srb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER AND ENTRY: (1) STAYING THIS CASE PENDING THE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN PLAINTIFFS CRIMINAL CASE CURRENTLY PENDING IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF MISSOURI; (2) ORDERING PLAINTIFF TO NOTIFY THE COURT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN THE MISSOURI CRIMINAL CASE; (3) DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO REFILING DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (DOCS. 45 , 85 ); (4) DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY (DOC. 64 ); (5) GRANTIN G PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXEMPTION FROM THE REGULAR MAIL SERVICE REQUIREMENT (DOC. 72 ); (6) DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL (DOC. 89 ) WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO REFILE; AND (7) DIRECTING THE CLERK TO ADMINISTRATIVELY PROCESS TH IS CASE PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT FOLLOWING THE ORDERED STAY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 10/6/2017. (srb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER AND ENTRY: (1) DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURTS TO UPDATE PRO SE PLAINTIFFS ADDRESS OF RECORD IN THIS CASE; (2) DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURTS TO SERVE PRO SE PLAINTIFF WITH A COPY OF THE DOCKET SHEET AND ALL DOCUMENTS FILED SINCE JUNE 28, 2017; (3) ORDERING PRO SE PLAINTIFF FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN 21 DAYS FROM THE ENTRY OF THIS ORDER; (4) ORDERING PRO SE PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE STAYED PENDING THE CONCLUSION OF CRIMINAL PROCEEDINGS IN THE EASTER N DISTRICT OF MISSOURI; (5) VACATING THE COURTS JULY 17, 2017 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (DOC. 79 ); AND (6) ADVISING PLAINTIFF OF HIS RESPONSIBILITY TO PROMPTLY ADVISE THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL OF CHANGES TO HIS ADDRESS OF RECORD. Amended Pleadings due by 9/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 8/16/2017. (srb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER AND ENTRY DENYING PRO SE PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION FORA PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (DOC. 73) Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 6/23/2017. (dm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 DECISION AND ENTRY: (1) GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (DOC. 24 ); (2) DENYING DEFENDANTS TWO MOTIONS TO STRIKE (DOCS. 33 , 35 ); (3) DISMISSING PRO SE PLAINTIFFS PROCEDURAL DUE PROCESS AND INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTI ONAL DISTRESS CLAIMS; AND (4) ORDERING DEFENDANTS TO FILE A MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR THE RETURN OF PROPERTY (DOC. 34 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 10/18/2016. (srb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moon v. Fischer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnell Wesly Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Metz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Prall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?