Lanton et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Lanton and Cynthia Lanton
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, U.S. Bank National Association and Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv00372
Filed: October 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: ADAMS
Presiding Judge: Walter H. Rice
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER - The discovery phase of this case has ended. No discovery motion or other matter referred to the undersigned Judicial Officer remains pending. The Clerk of Courts is directed to note in the record that: (1) referral of this case to the undersigned Judicial Officer has expired; and (2) no motion or other matter in this case remains pending before the undersigned Judicial Officer. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 8/25/2017. (srb)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER DISMISSING COUNT SIX AS AGAINST DEFENDANT EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICERS LLC - re 72 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 4/26/2017. (srb)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 DECISION AND ENTRY SUSTAINING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART PLAINTIFFS RONALD LANTON, CYNTHIA LANTON AND BLUE OCEAN AMBULETTE, LLC'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AND AMEND RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC'S FIRST REQ UESTS FOR ADMISSION (DOC. # 57 ); PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO DEFER RULING PURSUANT TO RULE 56(d) (DOC. # 58 ) IS OVERRULED; EQUIFAX'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. # 51 ) IS SUSTAINED; JUDGMENT SHALL ULTIMATELY ENTER IN FAVOR OF EQUIFA X AND AGAINST PLAINTIFFS ON PLAINTIFFS' CLAIM TWO - CONCLUSIONFor the foregoing reasons, the Court SUSTAINS IN PART and OVERRULES IN PART Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend. Doc. #57. Cynthia's deemed-admitted responses to the Requests fo r Admission are ordered withdrawn and substituted with the responses already provided by Cynthia to Equifax; Ronald shall not be permitted to withdraw or amend his deemed-admitted responses. The Court SUSTAINS Equifax's Motion for Summary Judg ment, Doc. #51, and OVERRULES Plaintiff's Rule 56(d) request for additional time to complete discovery. Doc. #58. Plaintiffs' Claim Two is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and judgment shall ultimately in favor of Equifax and against Plaintiffs on that claim. Plaintiffs' Claim Six remains pending against Equifax. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 4/17/2017. (srb)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 DECISION AND ENTRY SUSTAINING DEFENDANT OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT SIX OF THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. # 45 ); PLAINTIFFS RONALD LANTON, CYNTHIA LANTON AND BLUE OCEAN AMBULETTE SERVICES, LLC'S CLAIM OF TORTIOUS INTERFERENCE WITH BUSINESS RELATIONSHIP (COUNT SIX) IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS AGAINST OCWEN; JUDGMENT SHALL ULTIMATELY ENTER IN FAVOR OF OCWEN AND AGAINST PLAINTIFFS AS TO COUNT SIX. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 2/15/2017. (srb)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 DECISION AND ENTRY SUSTAINING MOTION TO DISMISS THESECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH RESPECT TO BLUE OCEANAMBULETTE SERVICES FILED BY DEFENDANTS OCWEN LOANSERVICING, LLC AND U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE, FOR THE C-BASS MORTGAGE LOAN ASSET B ACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-RPI (DOC. # 22 ); PLAINTIFFS RONALD LANTON, CYNTHIA LANTON AND BLUE OCEAN AMBULETTE, LLC'S CLAIM OF TORTIOUS INTERFERENCE WITH BUSINESS RELATIONSHIP/CONTRACT (COUNT VI) IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS AGAINST U.S. BANK AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS AGAINST OCWEN; PLAINTIFFS WILL HAVE TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ENTRY IN WHICH TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT AGAINST OCWEN, WITHIN THE STRICTURES OF FED. R. CIV. P. 11 sustaining 22 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 9/8/16. (pb)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 8/22/16. (pb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lanton et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Lanton
Represented By: Andrew J Gerling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Lanton
Represented By: Andrew J Gerling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?