Thompson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jason F Thompson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2015cv00382
Filed: October 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: PREBLE
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Rose
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:427
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - The Report and Recommendation 14 is ADOPTED in full, Plaintiff's counsel's motion for attorney's fees 12 is GRANTED, Plaintiff's counsel is AWARDED $16,191.00 in attorney's fees; andthe case remains TERMINATED on the docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 8-15-2017. (de)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION THAT: (1) PLAINTIFFS COUNSELS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEES (DOC. 12 ) BE GRANTED; (2) FEES, PURSUANT TO 42 U.S.C. § 406(b), IN THE AMOUNT OF $16,191.00 BE AWARDED; AND (3) THIS CASE REMAIN TERMINATED ON THE COURTS DOCKET. Objections to R&R due by 8/10/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 7/27/2017. (srb)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 9 Motion to Remand : ORDERED that the joint motion to remand pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) is accepted. The Commissioners decision is remanded for further administrativeproceedings. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 5/12/16. (ep)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason F Thompson
Represented By: Marilyn Ruth Donoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?