Clay v. Adecco USA
Plaintiff: Kevin Clay
Defendant: Adecco USA
Case Number: 3:2016cv00135
Filed: April 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Rose
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: This case is dismissed for failure to prosecute and is closed on the Courts Docket. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 6/12/2017. (jg) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION THAT THIS CASE BE: (1) DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE; AND (2) TERMINATED ON THE COURTS DOCKET re 2 Complaint filed by Kevin Clay Objections to R&R due by 6/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 5/23/2017. (pb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-Pro se Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE, in writing and within ten (10) days from the entry of this Order, as to why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute as a result of his failure to participate in the May 8, 2017 status conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 5/10/2017. (dm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clay v. Adecco USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adecco USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?