Long v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Carla J Long
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2016cv00154
Filed: April 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: GREENE
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Walter H. Rice
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING INITIAL AND SUPPLEMENTALREPORTS AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (DOC. # 9 , 13 ); OBJECTIONS TO INITIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF DEFENDANT NANCY A. BERRYHILL, ACTING COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL S ECURITY ADMINISTRATION (DOC. # 10 ), ARE OVERRULED; JUDGMENT TO BE ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF CARLA J. LONG AND AGAINST DEFENDANT COMMISSIONER, REVERSING THE COMMISSIONER'S DECISION THAT PLAINTIFF WAS NOT DISABLED AND, THEREFORE, NOT ENTITLED TO BENEFITS UNDER THE SOCIAL SECURITY ACT, AND REMANDING THE CAPTIONED CAUSE TO THE COMMISSIONER FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO THE FOURTH SENTENCE OF 42 U.S.C. § 405(g); TERMINATION ENTRY. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 7/25/17. (pb)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 6/21/2017. (dm)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION1 THAT: (1) THE ALJS NON-DISABILITY FINDING BE FOUND UNSUPPORTED BY SUBSTANTIAL EVIDENCE, AND REVERSED; (2) THIS MATTER BE REMANDED TO THE COMMISSIONER UNDER THE FOURTH SENTENCE OF 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) FOR PROCEEDINGS C ONSISTENT WITH THIS OPINION; AND (3) THIS CASE BE CLOSED - IT IS THEREFORE RECOMMENDED THAT: 1. The Commissioners non-disability finding be found unsupported by substantial evidence, and REVERSED; 2. This matter be REMANDED to the Commissioner under the Fourth Sentence of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) for proceedings consistent with this opinion; and 3. This case be CLOSED. Objections to R&R due by 6/19/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 6/5/2017. (srb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla J Long
Represented By: Gary Marc Blumenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?