Williams v. Trotwood Madison City Schools et al
Plaintiff: Nyrtistene Williams
Defendant: Trotwood Madison City Schools, Eddie Sample, Kevin Bell, Tracey Mallory and Jody McCurdy
Case Number: 3:2016cv00207
Filed: June 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Rose
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:794
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ENTRY AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 56(a), 24 , DISMISSING THE ACTION OF PLAINTIFF WITH PREJUDICE, AND TERMINATING THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 8-7-2018. (de)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AGREED ADDENDUM TO 17 Amended Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 9/1/17. (rp)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 4/13/17. (kma)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENTRY AND ORDER granting 9 Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 12-7-2016. (de)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Trotwood Madison City Schools et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nyrtistene Williams
Represented By: Lauren A. Kemp
Represented By: Erica Ann Probst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trotwood Madison City Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Sample
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey Mallory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody McCurdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?