Owensby v. Warden, Pickaway Correctional Institution
Petitioner: Lashon Owensby
Respondent: Warden, Pickaway Correctional Institution
Case Number: 3:2016cv00282
Filed: June 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Merz
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Rose
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 22 It is ordered that Petitioner's Motion for Relief from Judgment filed December 15, 2016 15 be DENIED. Petitioner is also DENIED a certificate of appealability and the Court hereby certifies to th e United States Court of Appeals that an appeal would be objectively frivolous and therefore should not be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 6-25-2018. (de)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER VACATING STAY; REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ON MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT - Based on the foregoing analysis, it is respectfully recommended that Petitioners Motion for Relief from Judgment should be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 5/29/18. (pb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - The Court has reviewed the Report and Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz 16 , to whom this case was referred pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b), and noting that no objectio ns have been filed thereto and that the time for filing such objections under Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b) has expired, hereby ADOPTS said Report and Recommendations. It is ordered that consideration of Petitioner's Motion for Relief from Judgment purs uant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b)(1) and (6) 15 is deferred pending decision of his pending federal appeal. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 1/11/2017. (de)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ON MOTION FOR RELIEFFROM JUDGMENT - It is respectfully recommended this Court defer considering Petitioner's Motion for Relief from Judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b)(1) and (6)(ECF No. 15) pending decision of the pending federal appeal. Objections to R&R due by 1/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 12/17/2016. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 7 . Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 9-27-2016. (de)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ON POST-JUDGMENT OBJECTIONS, CONSTRUED AS A MOTION TO AMEND - Owensby has not shown the Order Adopting Report and Recommendations in this case (ECF No. 4) contains any mistake of law. Therefore his Objections, construed a s a motion to amend the judgment, should be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 9/19/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 9/1/2016. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 2 Report and Recommendations : It is hereby ORDERED that the Petition be DISMISSED with prejudice. Petitioner is DENIED any requested certificate of appealability and the Court hereby certifies to the United States Court of Appeals that an appeal would be objectively frivolous and therefore should not be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 8/30/2016. (ep)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Lashon Owensby Objections to R&R due by 7/18/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 6/30/2016. (srb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owensby v. Warden, Pickaway Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lashon Owensby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, Pickaway Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?