Decker v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Loretta Decker
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2016cv00303
Filed: July 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Sharon L. Ovington
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Rose
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed on 7/11/2017. (srb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 13 - The Report and Recommendations docketed on June 19, 2017 13 is ADOPTED in full, the Commissioner's final non-disability decision on March 23, 2015 is vacated and the case is remande d to the Social Security Administration pursuant to sentence for of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) for further consideration consistent with the Report and Recommendations and the instant Decision and Entry; and the case is terminated on the docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 7-10-2017. (de)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: (1) The Commissioner's final non-disability decision on March 23, 2015 be vacated and the case be remanded for further proceedings consistent with this Report and Recommendations; and (2) The case be terminated on the docket of this Court. Objections to R&R due by 7/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 6-19-17. (mcm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Decker v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?