Prado v. Mazeika, et al.
Plaintiff: Glenda Jacqueline Prado
Defendant: Pat Mazeika, Beth Rubin, Amy Auburn, Malana Penney, Joshua Coomer, Beth Keller, Greene County, Ohio Board of Commissioners, Greene County, Ohio, Greene County Children's Services Board, Brian Huddleston and Other Unnamed Greene County Children's Services Employees
Case Number: 3:2016cv00320
Filed: August 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: GREENE
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Rose
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER OF DISMISSAL; TERMINATION ENTRY - The Court having been advised by counsel for the parties that the above matter has been settled, IT IS ORDERED that this action is hereby DISMISSED, with prejudice as to the parties, provided that any of the parties may, upon good cause shown within 60 days, reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 3/25/19. (pb)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 DECISION AND ENTRY SUSTAINING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT (DOC. # 70 ); SUSTAINING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. # 67 ). Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 3/21/19. (pb)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 DECISION AND ENTRY TENTATIVELY SUSTAINING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING EXHIBITS NOT PREVIOUSLY PRODUCED (DOC. #88) 88 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 3/5/19. (pb)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 DECISION AND ENTRY OVERRULING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE DISCOVERY (DOC. # 58 ) AND OVERRULING MOTION TO COMPEL (DOC. # 61 ). Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 11/5/18. (pb)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (DOC. # 53 ); OVERRULING PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS (DOC. # 54 ); SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (DOC. # 46 ). Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 9/21/18. (pb)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION1 THAT: (1) DEFENDANTS PARTIAL MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (DOC. 46 ) BE GRANTED; (2) PLAINTIFFS § 1983 CLAIMS FOR MALICIOUS PROSECUTION, FALSE ARREST, AND FALSE IMPRISONMENT ALL BE DISMISSED; AND (3) THIS CASE REMAIN PENDING WITH REGARD TO PLAINTIFFS EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION AND RETALIATION CLAIMS.Objections to R&R due by 8/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 7/18/18. (kma)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ENTRY AND ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS (DOC. 35 ) TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (DOC. 33 ) AND DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (DOC. 22 ) AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 10/2/17. (ep)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER AND ENTRY: (1) GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. 26); (2) ORDERING PLAINTIFF TO SEPARATELY FILE THE AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN SEVEN DAYS OF THE ENTRY OF THIS ORDER; AND (3) NOTIFYING PLAINTIFF THAT HER FAILU RE TO FILE THE AMENDED COMPLAINT AS ORDERED MAY RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THIS CASE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE***REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION1 THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (DOC. 22) BE DENIED AS MOOT Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 8/10/2017. (dm)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENTRY AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF GLENDA JACQUELINE PRADO'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL 19 . Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 11-28-2016. (de)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prado v. Mazeika, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Jacqueline Prado
Represented By: George Andrew Katchmer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Mazeika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Auburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malana Penney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Coomer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene County, Ohio Board of Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene County, Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene County Children's Services Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Huddleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other Unnamed Greene County Children's Services Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?