Easterling v. Cassanos Inc et al
Plaintiff: Warren Easterling, r
Defendant: Cassanos Inc, Ron Moon, Kiella Yarber and Brad Williams
Case Number: 3:2016cv00340
Filed: August 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Rose
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ENTRY AND ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J. NEWMAN (ECF 29 ), OVERRULING PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS (ECF 32 ), AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT (ECF 26 ): Case remains CLOSED on this Courts docket. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 10/3/17. (ep)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION THAT PRO SE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT (DOC. 26 ) BE DENIED ***** ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK TO SERVE THIS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION BY FIRST CLASS UNITED STATES MAIL- Based upon the foregoing, it is RECOMME NDED that Plaintiffs motion (doc. 26 ) be DENIED, and that this case remain TERMINATED on the Courts docket. Objections to R&R due by 8/10/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 7/27/17. (kma)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENTRY AND ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J. NEWMAN 19 , OVERRULING PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS 20 , GRANTING DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS 21 , GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS 12 AND TERMINATING CASE. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 5/1/2017. (de)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Easterling v. Cassanos Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Easterling, r
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassanos Inc
Represented By: Amy Christine Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Moon
Represented By: Amy Christine Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiella Yarber
Represented By: Amy Christine Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Williams
Represented By: Amy Christine Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?