Taylor v. Warden Marion Correctional Institution
Petitioner: Gudonavon Taylor
Respondent: Warden Marion Correctional Institution
Case Number: 3:2016cv00398
Filed: September 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Merz
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Rose
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - It is ordered that Petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis 16 is DENIED and Petitioner's motion for extension of time to file a motion for certification of appealability 18 is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 4-18-2017. (de)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - Petitioners Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. 16) should be denied. Mr. Taylor's motion for an extension of sixty days to file a motion for certificate of appealability (ECF No. 18) should be denied as moot. Objections to R&R due by 4/7/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 3/24/2017. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENTRY AND ORDER OVERRULING PETITIONER'S OBJECTIONS 13 AND ADOPTING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 12 DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT 10 . Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 2-7-2017. (de)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ON MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT; ORDER TO CLERK re 10 - It is accordingly recommended that Petitioners Motion for Relief from Judgment be denied as well as his motion to extend time to file objections. The Objections a ctually filed on January 3, 2017, without leave of Court should be stricken as untimely. Taylor has now discharged Conboy (PageID 70), and the Clerk is directed to remove Mr. Conboy and indicate Plaintiff is proceeding pro se. This Report is to be served on Mr. Taylor personally. Objections to R&R due by 1/18/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 1/4/17. (kma)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - It is hereby ORDERED that the Petition be DISMISSED with prejudice. Petitioner is DENIED any requested certificate of appealability and the Court hereby certifies to the United States Court of Appeals that an appeal would be objectively frivolous and therefore should not be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 10-11-2016. (de)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - The Magistrate Judge respectfully recommends that the Petition herein be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Because reasonable jurists would not disagree with this conclusion, Petitioner should be denied a certificate of appealabi lity and the Court should certify to the Sixth Circuit that any appeal would be objectively frivolous and therefore should not be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 10/3/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 9/16/2016. (kpf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Warden Marion Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gudonavon Taylor
Represented By: Patrick J Conboy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Marion Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?