Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Donnel Smith
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2016cv00428
Filed: October 13, 2016
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Referring Judge: Sharon L. Ovington
Presiding Judge: Walter H. Rice
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2018 18 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed on 3/16/18. (kma)
March 15, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING IN PART AND REJECTING IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATEJUDGE (DOC. # 14 ); OBJECTIONS OF DEFENDANT NANCY A. BERRYHILL,ACTING COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION,TO SAID JUDICIAL FILING (DOC. # 15 ) ARE SUSTAINED IN PART ANDOVERRULED IN PART; JUDGMENT TO BE ENTERED IN FAVOR OFPLAINTIFF DONNEL SMITH AND AGAINST THE DEFENDANTCOMMISSIONER, REVERSING THE DEFENDANT COMMISSIONER'SDECISION THAT PLAINTIFF WAS NOT DISABLED AND, THEREFORE, NOTENTITLED TO BENEFITS UNDER THE SOCIAL SECURITY ACT, ANDREMANDING THE CAPTIONED CAUSE TO THE COMMISSIONER FORFURTHER PROCEEDINGS CONSISTENT WITH THIS OPINION;TERMINATION ENTRY. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 3/15/2018. (jg)
February 12, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The Commissioner's non-disability finding be REVERSED; this case be REMANDED to the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) for payment of benefits; and the case be terminated on the docket of this Court. Objections to R&R due by 2/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 2/12/2018. (lk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnel Smith
Represented By: Gary Marc Blumenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Susana Ochoa
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?