Folck v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Folck and Neal C Folck
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2016cv00461
Filed: November 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: CLARK
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Ovington
Referring Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2003
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2017 Filing 15 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed on 3/27/2017. (srb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (DOCL. #12 ); DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE; JUDGMENT TO ENTER IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF; TERMINATION ENTRY - Based on the reasoning and citations of authority set forth by United States Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington in her Report and Recommendations, Doc. #12 , as well as upon a thorough de novo review of this Court's authority and the applicable law, the Court ADOPTS said judicial filing in its entirety. Although Plaintiff was mailed a copy of the Report and Recommendations, it was returned as undeliverable, as have all other mailings sent to Plaintiff this year. Because Plaintiff has failed to keep the Court apprised of his current address, leaving the Court with no way to contact him, the Court DISMISSES the case WITHOUT PREJUDICE to renewal, for want of prosecution. Judgment shall be entered in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff. The captioned case is hereby ordered terminated upon the docket records of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio, Western Division, at Dayton. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 3/27/2017. (srb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 27, 2017 Filing 13 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #12 . Mail sent to Neal C Folc.k (kma)
February 10, 2017 Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: (1) The case be dismissed without prejudice to renewal; and (2) The case be terminated on the Court's docket. Objections to R&R due by 2/24/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 2/10/17. (mcm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 31, 2017 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #10 .Mail sent to Neal C Folck. (kma)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE, in writing on or before February 7, 2017, why the Court should not dismiss this case due to his lack of prosecution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 1/24/2017. (lek) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 23, 2017 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #8 . Mail sent to Neal C Folck. (kma) (kma).
January 12, 2017 Set/Reset Dayton PPTO Deadlines: Motions not directed to pleadings due by 7/31/2017. (jmb)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Required disclosures under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(including medical package and damages package 1), January 24, 2017. Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2017. Motions directed to pleadings due by 1/31/2017. Lay Witness due by 5/1/2017. Plaintiff and Defendant Primary Expert due by 5/1/2017. Plaintiff and Defendant Rebuttal Expert due by 6/1/2017. Requests for admissions, 5/1/2017. Discovery due by 6/30/2017. Motions not directed to pleadings due by 7/31/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 1/11/17. (kma)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) Modified on 1/12/2017 (jmb).
January 9, 2017 Filing 7 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Linville, Ronald)
November 23, 2016 Filing 6 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/9/2017. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 11/23/2016. (lek) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 22, 2016 Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington added. (pb)
November 14, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE by Defendant Ford Motor Company of CERTIFICATE OF FILING (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Linville, Ronald)
November 10, 2016 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint filed by Ford Motor Company. (Linville, Ronald)
November 7, 2016 Filing 3 (Copy of) COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, filed by Neal C. Folck. (Originally filed in the Common Pleas Court of Clark County, Ohio, Case No. 16-cv-661 on October 4, 2016). (jmb)
November 7, 2016 If case is referred it will be assigned to Chief Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington. (jmb)
November 4, 2016 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Linville, Ronald)
November 4, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Common Pleas Court of Clark County, Ohio, case number 16cv-10-0661 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5721456), filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons) (Linville, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Folck v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Represented By: Ronald Gordon Linville
Represented By: Amanda Godzinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Folck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neal C Folck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?