Argabright v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sheila Argabright
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2016cv00494
Filed: December 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Sharon L. Ovington
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Rose
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 16 - The Report and Recommendations docketed on January 19, 2018 (Doc. #16) is ADOPTED in full, the ALJ's non-disability decision on December 9, 2015 is affirmed; and the case is terminated on the docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 2-7-2018. (de)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The ALJ's non-disability decision on December 9, 2015 be affirmed 2 Objections to R&R due by 2/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 1-19-18. (mcm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - In light of the information Plaintiff has provided in her recently submitted letter (Doc. # 10 ), the Report and Recommendation docketed on May 1, 2017 (Doc. # 9 ) is withdrawn. Plaintiff is ordered to file, by May 26, 2017, her Statement of Errors in which she shall raise her contentions about any error she believes the ALJ committed in his written decision and in reaching his conclusions that she is not under a disability and is not eligible for benefits. Plaintiff is advised to include in her Statement of Errors references to evidence in theadministrative record that she argues support her contentions. Plaintiff is placed on notice that if she does not file her Statement of Errors by May 26, 2017, her case may be dismissed due to her failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 5/10/2017. (srb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - IT IS THEEFORE RECOMMENDED THAT: Plaintiff's Complaint be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). re 2 Complaint filed by Sheila Argabright Objections to R&R due by 5/15/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 5/1/2017. (srb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Argabright v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Argabright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Adam R Sorkin
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?