Vyas, M.D. v. Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Darshan Vyas, M.D.
Defendant: Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company and Unum
Case Number: 3:2017cv00054
Filed: February 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MIAMI
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Rose
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF DISMISSAL -The Court having been advised by counsel for the parties that the above matter has been settled, IT IS ORDERED that this action is hereby DISMISSED, with prejudice as to the parties, provided that any of the parties may, upon good cause shown within 30 days, reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 1-22-2018. (de)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER- The Court hereby GRANTS the parties Joint Motion (Doc. #16) and ORDERS this matter to proceed as follows: 1. Dates by which parties must file a list of expert witnesses and provide their reports to opposing parties: Primar y experts: October 9, 2017 Rebuttal experts: November 13, 2017 2. Cut-off deadline for discovery: December 11, 2017 3. Cut-off date for filing of motions not directed to pleadings (including motions for summary judgment): January 8, 2018. The remainder of the schedule is unaffected. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 8/23/17. (kma)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 5/1/2017. (srb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vyas, M.D. v. Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darshan Vyas, M.D.
Represented By: Mark David Landes
Represented By: John Stephen Teetor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Brett K Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum
Represented By: Brett K Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?