Miller et al v. US Bank, NA et al
Plaintiff: William R Miller and Stacy A Miller
Defendant: US Bank, NA and US Bank Home Mortgage
Case Number: 3:2017cv00055
Filed: February 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: ADAMS
Presiding Judge: Walter H. Rice
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER OF DISMISSAL; TERMINATION ENTRY- The Court having been advised by counsel for the parties that the above matter has been settled, IT IS ORDERED that this action is hereby DISMISSED, with prejudice as to the parties, provided that any of the par ties may, upon good cause shown within 60 days, reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. Parties intending to preserve this Court's jurisdiction to enforce the settlement should be aware of Kokkonen v. Guardian Life Ins. Co. of Americ a, 114 S.Ct. 1673 (1994), and incorporate appropriate language in any substituted judgment entry. The Court will retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the settlement between the parties, if necessary. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 5/30/18. (kma)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER ON U.S. BANK'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES- This matter coming before the Court on U.S. Bank's Unopposed Motion for Leave to file Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses, the Court being fully advised, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT U.S. Bank's motion is granted. U.S. Bank is granted leave to file its amended answer and affirmative defenses within seven days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 4/18/18. (kma)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 26 Report and Recommendations - The Court has reviewed the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman (Doc. # 26 ), to whom this case was referred pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636 (b). The parties have not filed objections to the Report and Recommendation and the time for filing such objections under Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b) has expired. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that: (1) The Report and Recommendation (Doc. # 26 ) is ADO PTED in full; (2) Defendants' partial motion to dismiss (doc. # 5 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; (3) Counts Three, Nine, and Ten of Plaintiffs' complaint are hereby DISMISSED; and (4) Count One of Plaintiffs' complaint is DISMISSED to the limited extent Plaintiffs contend that Defendants' creation of an escrow account violated the Real Estate Settlement Procedures Act ("RESPA"), 12 U.S.C. § 2605. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 2/2/18. (kma)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. 5) BE GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 1/18/2018. (dm)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 8/18/17. (pb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. US Bank, NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William R Miller
Represented By: William R Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy A Miller
Represented By: William R Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank Home Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?