Heins et al v. Commerce and Industry Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Peter H. Heins
Defendant: Commerce and Industry Insurance Company, AIG AEROSPACE INSURANCE SERVICES, INC. and AIG AEROSPACE ADJUSTMENT SERVICES, INC.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00110
Filed: April 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: ADAMS
Presiding Judge: Walter H. Rice
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER DISMISSING CASE - TERMINATION ENTRY The Court having been advised by counsel for the parties that the above matter has been settled, IT IS ORDERED that this action is hereby DISMISSED, with prejudice as to the parties, provided that any of the parties may, upon good cause shown within 60 days, reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 12/4/18. (pb)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 DECISION AND ENTRY SUSTAINING UNOPPOSED MOTION TORESCHEDULE TRIAL DATE (DOC. # 66 ) - The Court finds the motion well-taken and sustains same. The status conference scheduled for October 10, 2018, at 5:00 p.m. is cancelled and rescheduled for November 5, 2018 at 4:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 10/16/18. (pb)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT: 1. Plaintiffs Motion for Sanction and to Compel Discovery (Doc. #40) is granted, in part, and denied, in part; 2. Plaintiffs Third Motion to Compel Discovery and for Sanctions (Doc. #49) is granted, in part, and denied, in part; 3. Defendants must produce all outstanding documents requested by Plaintiff within seven days of this Order. If Defendants do not have any additional documents or additions/modifications to their privilege log, Defendants counsel mus t file an affidavit with the Court stating that it has provided all of Plaintiffs requested documents, all documents that were not produced are privileged, and the privilege log is accurate; 4. Defendants must pay Plaintiffs reasonable fees and expe nses associated with preparing Plaintiffs Motion to Compel and for Sanctions (Doc. # 40 ), Plaintiffs Reply to Defendants Opposition (Doc. # 52 ) and Plaintiffs Reply to Defendants Submission of Supplemental Materials (Doc. # 61 ). Plaintiff is direc ted to file a declaration documenting his reasonable fees and expenses within 5 days of this Order. Defendants may, but are not required to, respond to Plaintiffs declaration within 5 days after it is filed; and 5. Plaintiffs Motion to Delay Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants Motion (Doc. # 47 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 10/15/18. (pb)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 DECISION AND ENTRY REJECTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (DOC. # 30 ), AND SUSTAINING OBJECTIONS THERETO OF DEFENDANTS COMMERCE AND INDUSTRY INSURANCE COMPANY AND AIG AEROSPACE INSURANCE SERVICES, INC. (DOC. # 32 ); O VERRULING MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT OF PLAINTIFFS PETER H. HEINS, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ADMINISTRATOR OF ESTATE OF CLAYTON MICHAEL HEINS (DOC. # 7 ); SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRKE PLAINTIFFS' SUR-REPLY (DOC. # 36 ); CONFERENCE CALL SET TO AGREE UPON A NEW SCHEDULING ORDER FORTHWITH. A new schedulingorder will be issued following a telephonic status conference to be convened by the Court at 11 :00 a.m. on Monday, January 29, 2018.
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: (1) 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Peter H. Heins be granted; (2) The case be remanded to the Clerk of Court, Darke County Court of Common Pleas; and (3) The case be terminated on the docket of this Court. Objections to R&R due by 11/7/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 10-24-17. (mcm)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR THE EXCHANGE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND FOR CLAWBACK OF PRIVILEGED OR PROTECTED INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 5/4/17. (pb)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING OR MOTION - New Responive date 4/24/2017. RE: 4 Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 4/7/2017. (srb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heins et al v. Commerce and Industry Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter H. Heins
Represented By: Konrad Kuczak
Represented By: Konrad Kuczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commerce and Industry Insurance Company
Represented By: Justin M. Schmidt
Represented By: Scott R Torpey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG AEROSPACE INSURANCE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Justin M. Schmidt
Represented By: Scott R Torpey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG AEROSPACE ADJUSTMENT SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Justin M. Schmidt
Represented By: Scott R Torpey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?