Hatmaker et al v. Papa John's Ohio, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tammy Hatmaker, Stephen Hatmaker, Kendall Peyton, Moses Knox, Alan Huxford, Derek Green, Andrew Polizia, Matthew Curry, Carol Brezinski and James Brezinski
Defendant: Papa John's Ohio, LLC, PJ Ohio, LLC, Serazen, LLC, BLD Brands, LLC, PJ Pizza Ohio, LLC, PJ Las Vegas, LLC, PJ North Carolina, LLC and Doug Pak
Case Number: 3:2017cv00146
Filed: April 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Rose
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 SCHEDULING ORDER - Cross-Motions for Partial Summary Judgment on the question of what constitutes a proper measure of minimum wage compliance for pizza delivery drivers is due April 22, 2019. Responses are due June 12, 2019. Replieswill only be permitted by leave of Court. An Amended Rule 26(f) will be due 24 days after the Court rules on the cross motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 4-8-2019. (de)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ENTRY AND ORDER denying 94 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 3-26-2019. (de)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be conditionally certified as a collective action pursuant to 29 U.S.C. § 216(b). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Notice of Collective Action Lawsuit attached as Exhibit A to Doc. 28 is APPROVED, and it is ORDERED that said notice be sent U.S. Mail to allcurrent and former delivery drivers employed by Defendant within the three years preceding the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all further stipulations and agreements between the p arties set forth in Doc. 28 are APPROVED, and it is ORDERED that the parties shall adhere thereto.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings (including Defendants obligation to file a response to the Complaint) are STAYED, except for briefing and adjudication of Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 27 ) until l0 days after conclusion of the opt-in period. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 10/23/17. (kma)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING re 24 JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND STAY OF LITIGATION PENDING DATA DISCLOSURE AND MEDIATION -It is ordered that all proceedings in this matter be and hereby are stayed through September 29, 2017, to permit the Parties opportunity to medi ate with Hunter Hughes, Esq. in Atlanta, Georgia, and it isFURTHER ORDERED that if settlement is not achieved, the Parties shall so notify the Court that their efforts were unsuccessful and Defendants shall have until October 29, 2017, to respond to the Amended Complaint and to file their response to Plaintiffs' pending Motion for Conditional Certification. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 8-30-2017. (de)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hatmaker et al v. Papa John's Ohio, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Hatmaker
Represented By: Andrew P Kimble
Represented By: Mark Alan Potashnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Hatmaker
Represented By: Andrew P Kimble
Represented By: Mark Alan Potashnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendall Peyton
Represented By: Andrew P Kimble
Represented By: Mark Alan Potashnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moses Knox
Represented By: Andrew P Kimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Huxford
Represented By: Andrew P Kimble
Represented By: Mark Alan Potashnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Green
Represented By: Andrew P Kimble
Represented By: Mark Alan Potashnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Polizia
Represented By: Andrew P Kimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Curry
Represented By: Andrew P Kimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Brezinski
Represented By: Andrew P Kimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Brezinski
Represented By: Andrew P Kimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Papa John's Ohio, LLC
Represented By: Mathew A. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PJ Ohio, LLC
Represented By: Mathew A. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serazen, LLC
Represented By: Mathew A. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLD Brands, LLC
Represented By: Mathew A. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PJ Pizza Ohio, LLC
Represented By: Mathew A. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PJ Las Vegas, LLC
Represented By: Mathew A. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PJ North Carolina, LLC
Represented By: Mathew A. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Pak
Represented By: Mathew A. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?