Tolley et al v. Menard, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dale Tolley and Charlene Tolley
Defendant: Menard, Inc., John Does 1-2 (names unknown), Inhealth Mutual and Healthscope Benefits, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00157
Filed: May 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Rose
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENTRY AND ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT 17 , GRANTING SECOND MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION 20 , TERMINATING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 16 AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY 19 FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION, REMANDING CASE TO MONTGOMERY COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, AND TERMINATING THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 1-8-2018. (de)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENTRY AND ORDER SETTING CONSOLIDATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. 17 ) AND MOTION TO REMAND (TO BE FILED) AND STAYING BRIEFING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. 16 ). the Court ORDERS the following consolidated briefing schedule on the Motion to Amend and anticipated motion to remand: Plaintiffs shall file a Motion to Remand this case to state courtwhich shall assume, for argument purposes, that the Motion to Amend will be grantedby no later than November 22, 2017; Menard shall file a consolidated response to the Motion to Amend and Motion to Remand by no later than December 6, 2017; Plaintiffs shall file a consolidated reply to Menards response by no later than December 13, 2017; Plaintiffs response to Menards Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 16 )is hereby stayed; The Court will set a new deadline for Plaintiffs to respond to the Motion for Summary Judgment after the Court rules on the Motion to Amend and Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 11/15/17. (pb)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENTRY AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION (DOC. 9 ): Plaintiffs to file a motion for leave to amend the Complaint if they intend to pursue a claim against the above-referenced John Doe Defendant in this action. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 10/2/17. (ep)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tolley et al v. Menard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menard, Inc.
Represented By: D Patrick Kasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-2 (names unknown)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inhealth Mutual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthscope Benefits, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Tolley
Represented By: Charles Matthew Rittgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Tolley
Represented By: Charles Matthew Rittgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?