Gibson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Yonest Gibson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2017cv00210
Filed: June 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Rose
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENTRY AND ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS 12 , ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 11 , AFFIRMING THE COMMISSIONER'S NON-DISABILITY FINDING AND TERMINATING THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 4-23-2018. (de)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION1 THAT: (1) THE ALJS NON-DISABILITY FINDING BE FOUND SUPPORTED BY SUBSTANTIAL EVIDENCE, AND AFFIRMED; AND (2) THIS CASE BE CLOSED Objections to R&R due by 3/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 3/5/18. (pb)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The undersigned ORDERS as follows: (1) counsel shall meet, confer and determine whether consent to the undersigned is unanimous and, if so, to file a consent form with the Court (the form can be found at http://www.uscourts.gov/sites/default/f iles/ao085.pdf); (2) counsel shall review the Seventh Amended Magistrate Judges General Order No. 11 (effective 4/26/16) (found at http://www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/content/general-orders-ohio-southern-district); (3) the parties are GRANTED leave to stipu late to extensions of 28 days for the filing of the Statement of Errors, the memorandum in opposition, and the reply memorandum; and (4) the Commissioner shall determine whether a motion to remand is appropriate prior to the filing of the Statement of Errors. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 10/10/2017. (dm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yonest Gibson
Represented By: Stephanie D Dobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?