Walther v. Florida Tile, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James Walther
Defendant: Florida Tile, Inc. and Panariagroup USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00257
Filed: August 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Rose
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ENTRY AND ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS (DOC. 40 ); ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (DOC. 39 ); GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VOLUNTARILY DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE (DOC. 29 ); DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STAY (DOCS. 29 , 30 ); DEN YING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR INSTANTER LEAVE TO [RETROACTIVELY] FILE MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (AND REPLY BRIEF) (DOC. 35 ); DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANT'S RULE 12(C) MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (DOC. 28 ); AND TERMINATING CASE. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 7/13/18. (ep)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: 1) Plaintiff's Motion To Voluntarily Dismiss Without Prejudice 29 be granted, and the case be dismissed without prejudice; 2) Plaintiff's Motions To Stay [29, 30] be denied as moot; 3) Defendant's Motion F or Instanter Leave To [Retroactively] File Motion For Partial Judgment On The Pleadings (And Reply Brief) 35 be denied; and 4) Defendant's Rule 12(c) Motion For Partial Judgment On The Pleadings 28 be denied without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 6/22/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 6-8-18. (mcm)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 3/12/18. (kma)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER as to Joint Motion for Protective Order 23 - For these reasons, the proposed Stipulated Protective Order will not be approved in its current form. The parties may submit a revised proposed stipulated protective order in compliance with the ho lding in Bankers Trust Co. for the Courts approval and entry. The proposed stipulated protective order must also require a party designating material as CONFIDENTIAL to provide legal justification for filing the document under seal. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 3/6/18. (kma)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RECUSAL ORDER- This case was randomly assigned to the undersigned upon its filing in August 2017. District Judge Rose has now entered a Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order which refers the case to me for pretrial management purposes (ECF No. 19 , PageID 154). However, many of the dates set in the Order occur after expiration of my term of office on March 1, 2018. Therefore, I recuse myself from further judicial participation in this case and direct theClerk to randomly reassign the case to one of the other Magistrate Judges resident at Dayton. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 10/16/17. (kma)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED ENTRY AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 7 . The Court VACATES the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, previously scheduled for August 31, 2017. The Court sets this matter f or a Preliminary Pretrial Conference on October 12, 2017 at 10:00 AM. The parties should include a proposed date for the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction with the proposed calendar to be submitted following their Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) conference. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 8-28-2017. (de)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walther v. Florida Tile, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Tile, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew S. Haring
Represented By: Robert C Petrulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panariagroup USA, Inc.
Represented By: Robert C Petrulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Walther
Represented By: Craig Thomas Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?