Mason, et al. v.Synchrony Bank
Plaintiff: Mary Mason, Yahaira Diaz-Reyes and Karetta Partridge
Defendant: SYNCHRONY BANK
Case Number: 3:2017cv00314
Filed: September 8, 2017
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Walter H. Rice
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 DECISION AND ENTRY SUSTAINING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART DEFENDANT SYNCHRONY BANK'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY PROCEEDINGS (DOC. # 18 ), AND OVERRULING AS MOOT PLAINTIFFS MARY MASON, YAHAIRA DIAZ-REYES AND KARETTA PARTRIDGE'S MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION, EXPEDITED OPT-IN DISCOVERY, AND COURT-SUPERVISED NOTICE TO POTENTIAL OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS (DOC. # 15 ); PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT (DOC. # 1 ) IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; TERMINATION ENTRY. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 1/22/2018. (srb)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ENTRY SUSTAINING DEFENDANT SYNCHRONY BANK'S MOTION FOR POSTPONEMENT OF BRIEFING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION (DOC. # 16 ), AND STAYING BRIEFING ON MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION, EXPEDITED OPT-IN DISCOVERY, AND COURT-SUPERVISED NOTICE TO POTENTIAL OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS OF PLAINTIFFS MARY MASON, YAHAIRA DIAZREYES AND KARETTA PARTRIDGE (DOC. # 15 ), UNTIL THE COURT ISSUES A RULING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO DISMISS, OR ALTERNATIVEL Y, TO STAY THE PROCEEDINGS (DOC. # 18 ), NO LATER THAN WEDNESDAY, JANUARY 31, 2018; STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS FOR CLAIMS UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT OF 1938 IS TOLLED FROM DECEMBER 18, 2017, UNTIL 5:00 P.M. EST ON WEDNESDAY FEBRUARY 7, 2018; TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 5:00 P.M. EST ON WEDNESDAY, JANUARY 31, 2018. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 1/2/2018. (srb)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ONE-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE ITS REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO DISMISS, OR ALTERNATIVELY, TO STAY THE PROCEEDINGS - This matter comes before t his Court upon the Unopposed Motion For One-Day Extension Of Time For Defendant To File Its Reply Memorandum ln Support Of Its Motion To Compel Arbitration And To Dismiss, Or Alternatively, To Stay The Proceedings. For the reasons stated in the Motion, and for good cause shown, the Motion is GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that Synchrony Bank's reply deadline is extended from December 14, 2017 until December 15, 2017.IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 12/7/2017. (srb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason, et al. v.Synchrony Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Mason
Represented By: Chastity Lynn Christy
Represented By: Lori M. Griffin
Represented By: Anthony J Lazzaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yahaira Diaz-Reyes
Represented By: Chastity Lynn Christy
Represented By: Lori M. Griffin
Represented By: Anthony J Lazzaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karetta Partridge
Represented By: Chastity Lynn Christy
Represented By: Lori M. Griffin
Represented By: Anthony J Lazzaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYNCHRONY BANK
Represented By: Caroline Gentry
Represented By: Jonathan D Lotsoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?