Robinson v. Montgomery County District 1 Courts et al
Plaintiff: David Robinson
Defendant: Montgomery County District 1 Courts, Montgomery County A.P.A. Post Release Control and Adult Parole Authority
Case Number: 3:2017cv00403
Filed: November 28, 2017
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MADISON
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Merz
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Rose
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed on 2/2/18. (kma)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 6 - The Court has reviewed the Report and Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz to whom this case was referred pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b), and noting that no objection s have been filed thereto and that the time for filing such objections under Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b) has expired, hereby ADOPTS said Report and Recommendations. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the instant case be dismissed without prejudice based on the filing of Defendants habeas petition in Case No. 3:18-cv-001.. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 1-31-2018. (de)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - It is respectfully recommended that the petition be dismissed without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 1/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 1/9/2018. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO FILE HABEAS CORPUS PETITION IN REQUIRED FORM - In order to begin to process Mr. Robinsons case, the Court needs the information required by the standard form of petition for writ of habeas corpus. Accordingly, the Clerk is ordered to furni sh Mr. Robinson with the standard form and he is ordered to complete it and file it with this Court not later than January 5, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 12/8/2017. (srb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING REFERENCE- Plaintiffs Complaint essentially seeks relief in the form of a writ of habeas corpus because, rather than pursuing money damages, he asks for an immediate or speedier release from his present confinement and from his sen tence to post-release control. This case is therefore TRANSFERRED from Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovingtons docket to the docket Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz. Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz added. Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 12/7/17. (kma)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Montgomery County District 1 Courts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County District 1 Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County A.P.A. Post Release Control
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adult Parole Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?