Thompson v. Warden, Warren Correctional Institution

Petitioner: Craig A Thompson
Respondent: Warden, Warren Correctional Institution
Case Number: 3:2018cv00117
Filed: April 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Referring Judge: Michael R. Merz
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Rose
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DENYING "REQUEST FOR REMAINDER OF THE RECORD" 41 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 12/3/2018. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 DECISION AND ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RECONSIDER (ECF No. 34). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 11/21/2018. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SUPPLEMENTAL DECISION AND ORDER ON MOTION FOR DISCOVERY; CASE STAYED PENDING EXHAUSTION - It is hereby ORDERED, sua sponte, that consideration of the merits of this case be STAYED pending exhaustion of Petitioner's presently pending appeal of the denial of his post-conviction petition to the Ohio Second District Court of Appeals and his further appeal to the Supreme Court of Ohio if the Second District's decision is adverse to his claims. Both parties are ordered to keep this Cour t currently apprised of the status of those appeals. When those appeals are complete, Petitioner may renew his motion for discovery of Defense Exhibit B and/or to expand the record in this Court to include that exhibit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 11/ 13/2018. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 DECISION AND ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR DISCOVERY 25 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 11/5/2018. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DECISION AND ORDER DENYING MOTION TO EXPAND THERECORD AND GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME 13 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 10/8/2018. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR STAY 4 WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 4/18/2018. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Warden, Warren Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Craig A Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, Warren Correctional Institution
Represented By: William H Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?