Fricke v. Warden, Noble Correctional Institution
Petitioner: Joseph Fricke
Respondent: Warden, Noble Correctional Institution
Case Number: 3:2018cv00198
Filed: June 4, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Merz
Presiding Judge: Walter H. Rice
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ON RECOMMITTAL; DECISION AND ORDER STRIKING RENEWED NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO OBJECT - Objections to R&R due by 12/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 11/30/2018. (kpf)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUBSTITUTED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - Because the Petition was filed almost a year after the statute of limitations expired, it should be dismissed with prejudice as barred by the statute of limitations. Because reasonable jurists would not dis agree with this conclusion, Petitioner should be denied a certificate of appealability and the Court should certify to the Sixth Circuit that any appeal would be objectively frivolous and therefore should not be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 11/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 11/1/2018. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER WITHDRAWING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONSAND REQUIRING RESPONDENT TO ANSWER - It is hereby ORDERED that Respondent shall, not later than September 1, 2018, file ananswer conforming to the requirements of Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases. Petitioner may, not later than twenty-one days after the answer is filed, file and serve areply to the answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 6/26/2018. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification. This document was also served along with the petition to Attorney General's office)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - Because the Petition was filed almost a year after the statute of limitations expired, it shouldbe dismissed with prejudice as barred by the statute of limitations. Because reasonable juristswould not disagree with this conclusion, Petitioner should be denied a certificate of appealabilityand the Court should certify to the Sixth Circuit that any appeal would be objectively frivolous and therefore should not be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 6/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 6/7/2018. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fricke v. Warden, Noble Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Fricke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, Noble Correctional Institution
Represented By: Mary Anne Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?