Newburn v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Christina Newburn
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration and SSA
Case Number: 3:2018cv00378
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Ovington
Referring Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:427
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kiywhanna LaChic Kellup for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Kellup, Kiywhanna) Modified attorney role on 12/17/2018 (rp).
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 11/23/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Donoff, Marilyn)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (kma)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6683266), filed by Christina Newburn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Summons) (Donoff, Marilyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newburn v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kiywhanna LaChic Kellup
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Newburn
Represented By: Marilyn Ruth Donoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?