Leffers et al v. Woodbridge et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Phillips and Joshua Leffers
Defendant: Antonio Dorvil, Donald J. Woodbridge, Progressive Insurance and RXG Cargo Corp.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00408
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Progressive Insurance. (Johnson, Christopher)
December 18, 2018 Notice: If case is to be referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman. (kma)
December 17, 2018 Case transferred in from Cincinnait Division on 12/17/2018 Case Number 1:18-cv-877. Case assigned to Judge Thomas M. Rose.. (jlw)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The above-captioned matter is hereby TRANSFERRED from the docket of TheHonorable Susan J. Dlott to the Clerk of this Court for reassignment in the Western Division inDayton. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 12/17/2018. (jlw)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 (Copy of) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed in Montgomery County Common Pleas Court under case number 2018 CV 05445, on December 13, 2018, filed by Donald J. Woodbridge. (bjc) Modified on 12/18/2018 to add text (kma).
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 (Copy of)ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand, originally filed in Montgomery County Common Pleas Court filed by Antonio Dorvil. (bjc) Modified on 12/18/2018 to add text (kma).
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 (Copy of)COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND Originally Filed in the Montgomery County Court of Common Pleas in case 2018 CV 05445, on November 26, 2018, against Antonio Dorvil, Progressive Insurance, RXG Cargo Corp., Donald J. Woodbridge, filed by Joshua Leffers, Matthew Phillips. (bjc) Modified on 12/18/2018 to add text (kma).
December 17, 2018 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (bjc)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County Common Pleas, case number 2018CV05445 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6718935), filed by Antonio Dorvil. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Answers, #4 Exhibit Complaint, #5 Exhibit Notice - Service, #6 Exhibit Appearance of Counsel) (Smith, Adair)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leffers et al v. Woodbridge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Phillips
Represented By: Richard P Gabelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Leffers
Represented By: Richard P Gabelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Dorvil
Represented By: Adair Martin Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Woodbridge
Represented By: Bryan Joseph Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Insurance
Represented By: Christopher Freeman Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RXG Cargo Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?