Verso Corporation et al v. United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC et al
Plaintiff: Verso Corporation and Verso Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan
Defendant: United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC, Douglas A Carolfi, The Office of Professional Employees' International Union, AFL-CIO, James W Folcik, The United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry, AFL-CIO, Milton J Anderson, Bradley A Baldock, John E Buckholtz, III, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO, Ronald P Ashbeck, The International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, AFL-CIO, Kenneth B Smith, Jean A Anhalt, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Local 648, John C Anderson, Anne M Anderson, Wendy L Bowman and Susan M Bakovka
Case Number: 3:2019cv00006
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER sustaining #26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Aaron Dumas. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 02/26/2019. (tp)
February 22, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6807954) of Aaron Dumas by Defendants Susan M Bakovka, The Office of Professional Employees' International Union, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Cook, David)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATED ORDER- IT IS ORDERED that the six Union defendants -(1) United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFLCIO- CLC ("USW"); (2) International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO ("IBEW"); (3) International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT"); (4) International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, AFL-CIO ("IAM"); (5) Office and Professional Employees' InternationalUnion, AFL-CIO ("OPEIU"); and (6) United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada, AFL-CIO ("UA")-shall have until March 22, 2019 to respond to the complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the date for each individual-retiree defendant-(1) John E. Buckholtz, III; (2) Milton J. Anderson; (3) Anne M. Anderson; (4) Jean A. Anhalt; (5) John C. Anderson; (6) James W. Folcick; (7) Kenneth B. Smith; (8) Douglas A. Carolfi; (9) Wendy L. Bowman; (10) Ronald P. Ashbeck; (11) Susan M. Bakovka; and (12) Bradley A. Baldock-if properly served, shall have until March 22, 2019 to respond to the complaint, or 21 days to respond to the complaint dated from proper service, whichever response date is later. This order is intended to grant additional time to the individual retiree-defendants while plaintiffs and the union defendants review this matter, and nothing in this order shall be construed to restrict or waive anyrights of the individual retiree-defendants. RE #23 .. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 2/15/19. (kma)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER sustaining #24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sue D. Gunter. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 02/15/2019. (tp)
February 13, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6793828) of Sue D. Gunter by Defendant International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Local 648. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Cook, David)
February 12, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 3/22/2019. by Defendants International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Local 648, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO, The International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, AFL-CIO, The Office of Professional Employees' International Union, AFL-CIO, The United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry, AFL-CIO, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Cook, David)
February 12, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Bennett P. Allen for Defendants International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Local 648, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO, The International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, AFL-CIO, The Office of Professional Employees' International Union, AFL-CIO, The United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry, AFL-CIO, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC (Allen, Bennett)
February 12, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Cook for Defendants International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Local 648, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO, The International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, AFL-CIO, The Office of Professional Employees' International Union, AFL-CIO, The United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry, AFL-CIO, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC (Cook, David)
February 6, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant James W Folcik. James W Folcik served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. (kma)
February 5, 2019 Filing 19 Summons Returned Unexecuted by The United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry, AFL-CIO. (jmb)
February 4, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC on 1/11/2019, answer due 3/12/2019. (Moore, Curtis)
February 1, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Wendy L Bowman, The United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry, AFL-CIO. Wendy L Bowman served on 1/19/2019, answer due 2/11/2019; The United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry, AFL-CIO served on 1/19/2019, answer due 2/11/2019. (srb)
January 30, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Susan M Bakovka. Susan M Bakovka served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. (kma)
January 28, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to The International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, AFL-CIO. (kma)
January 28, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Anne M Anderson, John C Anderson, Milton J Anderson, Jean A Anhalt, Douglas A Carolfi, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Local 648, Kenneth B Smith, The Office of Professional Employees' International Union, AFL-CIO. Anne M Anderson served on 1/24/2019, answer due 2/14/2019; John C Anderson served on 1/19/2019, answer due 2/11/2019; Milton J Anderson served on 1/19/2019, answer due 2/11/2019; Jean A Anhalt served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019; Douglas A Carolfi served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/13/2019; International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Local 648 served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019; Kenneth B Smith served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019; The Office of Professional Employees' International Union, AFL-CIO served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (kma)
January 25, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant John E Buckholtz, III. John E Buckholtz, III served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. (kma)
January 23, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Bradley A Baldock. (Please note the box containing the complaint and exhibits are in the Dayton Clerk's Office). (jmb)
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Ronald P Ashbeck. (kma)
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by the Clerk: A Copy of the Complaint and Issued Summons were sent via certified mail to the named defendants. (daf)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC. (kma)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Local 648, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO, The International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, AFL-CIO, The Office of Professional Employees' International Union, AFL-CIO, The United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry, AFL-CIO. (kma)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form, #5 Summons Form) (Moore, Curtis)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Milton J Anderson. (jmb)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Anne M Anderson, John C Anderson, Jean A Anhalt, Ronald P Ashbeck, Susan M Bakovka, Bradley A Baldock, Wendy L Bowman, John E Buckholtz, III, Douglas A Carolfi, James W Folcik, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Local 648, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO, Kenneth B Smith, The International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, AFL-CIO, The Office of Professional Employees' International Union, AFL-CIO, The United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry, AFL-CIO, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC. (jmb)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form, #5 Summons Form, #6 Summons Form, #7 Summons Form, #8 Summons Form, #9 Summons Form, #10 Summons Form, #11 Summons Form, #12 Summons Form, #13 Summons Form, #14 Summons Form, #15 Summons Form, #16 Summons Form, #17 Summons Form) (Moore, Curtis)
January 9, 2019 Notice: If this case is to be referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington. (kma)
January 8, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0648-6743391 (kk)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Verso Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan. (Moore, Curtis)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Verso Corporation, Verso Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan. (Moore, Curtis)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 paid), filed by Verso Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Verso Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Civil Cover Sheet) (Moore, Curtis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verso Corporation et al v. United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC
Represented By: Bennett P. Allen
Represented By: David M. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas A Carolfi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Office of Professional Employees' International Union, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Aaron Dumas
Represented By: Bennett P. Allen
Represented By: David M. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W Folcik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Bennett P. Allen
Represented By: David M. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milton J Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley A Baldock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E Buckholtz, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Bennett P. Allen
Represented By: David M. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald P Ashbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Bennett P. Allen
Represented By: David M. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth B Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean A Anhalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Local 648
Represented By: Bennett P. Allen
Represented By: David M. Cook
Represented By: Sue D. Gunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne M Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy L Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan M Bakovka
Represented By: Aaron Dumas
Represented By: David M. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verso Corporation
Represented By: Curtis G. Moore
Represented By: Jeffrey D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verso Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan
Represented By: Curtis G. Moore
Represented By: Jeffrey D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?