Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Turner et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Infusion's Fine Dining & Spirits LLC, Renea D Turner, Champion City Sports Club and Voodoo Moon
Case Number: 3:2019cv00012
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Infusion's Fine Dining & Spirits LLC. (Lonstein, Wayne)
March 7, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Infusion's Fine Dining & Spirits LLC. Infusion's Fine Dining & Spirits LLC served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Lonstein, Wayne)
March 7, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Renea D Turner. Renea D Turner served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Lonstein, Wayne)
March 7, 2019 Notice of Correction re: 13 Affidavit of Service, 11 Affidavit of Service, 12 Affidavit of Service. Counsel used incorrect event, counsel should re-file documents using Summons Issued; which is located under Civil Events-Initial Pleadings and Service-Service of Process. Documents will be restricted. (srb)
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Renea D Turner. (kma)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Infusion's Fine Dining & Spirits LLC, Renea D Turner. (kma)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. as to defendant, Infusions Fine Dining & Spirits LLC (Lonstein, Wayne)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. as to defendant, Registered Agent for Infusions Fine Dining & Spirits LLC (Lonstein, Wayne)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. as to defendant, Renea D. Turner (Lonstein, Wayne)
January 14, 2019 Notice: If case is to be referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington. (kma)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding Copyright (Lonstein, Wayne)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Lonstein, Wayne)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement to Complaint, #2 Supplement to Complaint) (Lonstein, Wayne)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Infusion's Fine Dining & Spirits LLC, Renea D Turner ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6748583), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Summons as to Defendant, Renea D. Turner, #3 Summons Form Summons as to Registered Agent, #4 Summons Form Summons as to Defendant Infusion's Fine Dining & Spirits LLC) (Lonstein, Wayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Turner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infusion's Fine Dining & Spirits LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renea D Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champion City Sports Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voodoo Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Wayne D Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?