2700 Miamisburg-Centerville Road, LLC v. Elder Ohio I Delaware Business Trust et al
Plaintiff: 2700 Miamisburg-Centerville Road, LLC
Defendant: Elder Ohio I Delaware Business Trust, Jane Doe, John Doe, Montgomery County Treasurer and Jon F. Hanson
Case Number: 3:2019cv00051
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Ovington
Referring Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff 2700 Miamisburg-Centerville Road, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Richard Boydston) (Boydston, Richard)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENTRY AND ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REMAND #6 , REMANDING CASE TO THE MONTGOMERY COUNTY, OHIO COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, AND ORDERING PLAINTIFF TO FILE A MOTION FOR FEES UNDER 28 U.S.C. Section 1447(c) WITHIN 10 DAYS, CASE IS HEREBY TERMINATED ON THE DOCKET. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 4-5-2019. (de)
March 29, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff 2700 Miamisburg-Centerville Road, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Declaration of Sabrina Hazen) (Boydston, Richard)
March 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Plaintiff 2700 Miamisburg-Centerville Road, LLC of Second Report of Paul M. Plattner, Receiver (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2nd Report of Receiver) (Boydston, Richard)
March 18, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Defendants Elder Ohio I Delaware Business Trust, Jon F. Hanson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donald L. Warner III) (Ramsey, Jamie)
March 15, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff 2700 Miamisburg-Centerville Road, LLC. (Boydston, Richard)
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Elder Ohio I Delaware Business Trust. (Ramsey, Jamie)
March 12, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, filed by Jon F. Hanson. (Ramsey, Jamie)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, filed by Elder Ohio I Delaware Business Trust. (Ramsey, Jamie)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Plaintiff 2700 Miamisburg-Centerville Road, LLC re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand (Boydston, Richard)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff 2700 Miamisburg-Centerville Road, LLC. (Boydston, Richard)
February 25, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Elder Ohio I Delaware Business Trust answer due 3/19/2019; Jon F. Hanson answer due 3/19/2019. re #5 stipulation. Please note that Defendant, Montgomery County Treasurer did not sign the Stipulation. (kma)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO MOVE, PLEAD, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Defendants Elder Ohio I Delaware Business Trust, Jon F. Hanson. (Ramsey, Jamie)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 (Copy of) ANSWER to #2 (copy of) Complaint, filed by Montgomery County Treasurer, originally filed in Montgomery County Common Pleas Court on January 28, 2019, under case number 2019 CV 00314. (kma) Modified on 2/22/2019 (rp).
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Defendants Elder Ohio I Delaware Business Trust, Jon F. Hanson re #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet (Ramsey, Jamie)
February 20, 2019 NOTICE: Counsel is directed to file a supplemental civil cover sheet which is required for Notice of Removal cases. The supplemental cover sheet is located on the Court's website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov under 'C' in the 'forms' tab. (kma)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 (Copy of) COMPLAINT against All Defendants originally filed in Montgomery County Common Pleas Court on January 22, 2019, under case number 2019 CV 00314. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A legal decription, #3 exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit B-1, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M) (kma)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019 CV 00314 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6801166), filed by Jon F. Hanson, Elder Ohio I Delaware Business Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2, #3 Exhibit 1 - Part 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ramsey, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 2700 Miamisburg-Centerville Road, LLC v. Elder Ohio I Delaware Business Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 2700 Miamisburg-Centerville Road, LLC
Represented By: Richard Mason Boydston, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elder Ohio I Delaware Business Trust
Represented By: Jamie M Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County Treasurer
Represented By: Michele Denise Phipps
Represented By: Mathias Henry Heck, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon F. Hanson
Represented By: Jamie M Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?