Mohlman v. Financial Industry Regulatory Authority et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Allen Mohlman
Defendant: Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc., Susan Schroeder, John Does and Heidi Brown
Case Number: 3:2019cv00154
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants Heidi Brown, Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc., Susan Schroeder. (Cox, Jeffrey)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Allen Mohlman. (Katchmer, George)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Heidi Brown, Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc., Susan Schroeder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Cox, Jeffrey)
May 30, 2019 Notice: If case is to be referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington. (kma)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 (Copy of) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, originally filed in Montgomery County Common Pleas Court on April 26,2019, under case number 2019 CV 01883. (kma)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc., Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. for Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc... (Cox, Jeffrey)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Defendants Heidi Brown, Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc., Susan Schroeder of Filing Removal Papers in Montgomery County Common Pleas Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Cox, Jeffrey)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendants from Montgomery County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019 CV 01883 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6938452), filed by Financial Industry Regulatory Authority. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Case Information Sheet, #4 Instructions for Service, #5 Summons, #6 Return of Service, #7 Return of Service, #8 Return of Service, #9 Failure of Service) (Cox, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohlman v. Financial Industry Regulatory Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey T Cox
Represented By: Stephen A Weigand
Represented By: Melinda K Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Schroeder
Represented By: Jeffrey T Cox
Represented By: Stephen A Weigand
Represented By: Melinda K Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Brown
Represented By: Jeffrey T Cox
Represented By: Stephen A Weigand
Represented By: Melinda K Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Allen Mohlman
Represented By: George Andrew Katchmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?