Stehle et al v. Venture Logistics LLC et al
Plaintiff: Admin Joseph P Stehle, Jr, Virginia Riley, Kimberly Stehle, Kristy Shoopman and Joseph P Stehle, Jr
Defendant: Sean P Kelley, American Guarantee and Liability Ins. Co and Venture Logistics LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00169
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to American Guarantee and Liability Ins. Co on 6/12/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Brannon, Douglas)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William B Benson for Defendant American Guarantee and Liability Ins. Co (Benson, William)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert R. Foos, Jr. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 7/2/2019. (jmb)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6992130) of Robert R. Foos, Jr. by Defendant Sean P Kelley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Bakiaj, Klevis)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Klevis Bakiaj for Defendant Sean P Kelley (Bakiaj, Klevis)
June 10, 2019 If case is referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington. (jmb)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiff Joseph P Stehle, Jr re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Brannon, Douglas)
June 10, 2019 NOTICE re #1 Complaint : Pursuant to S.D. Ohio Civ. R. 3.1 every complaint or other document initiating a civil action must be accompanied by a completed civil cover sheet on a form available from the Clerk and on the Courts website at http://www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/ohio-southern-district-forms. Please file a civil cover sheet using the event Civil-Other Filings-Notices-Notice (Other) and link the document back to the complaint. (kma)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6957207), filed by Joseph P Stehle, Jr, Kristy Shoopman, Virginia Riley, Kimberly Stehle. (Brannon, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stehle et al v. Venture Logistics LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean P Kelley
Represented By: Robert R. Foos, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher G. Keim
Represented By: Klevis Bakiaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Guarantee and Liability Ins. Co
Represented By: William B Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venture Logistics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Admin Joseph P Stehle, Jr
Represented By: Douglas Dustin Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Riley
Represented By: Douglas Dustin Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Stehle
Represented By: Douglas Dustin Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy Shoopman
Represented By: Douglas Dustin Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph P Stehle, Jr
Represented By: Douglas Dustin Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?