Leininger v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Rosalind Leininger
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 3:2019cv00196
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael J Newman
Referring Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Judy C. Tsui for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Tsui, Judy)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 6/27/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Dobson, Stephanie)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (kma)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Rosalind Leininger. (kma)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER GRANTING #1 PLAINTIFF'S Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 6/27/2019. (dm)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Rosalind Leininger. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form, #5 Summons Form, #6 Summons Form) (Dobson, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leininger v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Judy C. Tsui
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalind Leininger
Represented By: Stephanie D Dobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?