Roberts et al v. USA
Plaintiff: N. R., Minor, Deborah Chong, Joshua Roberts and N.R.
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 3:2019cv00202
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2674
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant USA. USA served on 8/5/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. re #3 (kma)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Tom Jacob; and granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jamal Alsaffar. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 07/17/2019. (jmb)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7011973) of Jamal Alsaffar by Plaintiffs Deborah Chong, N.R., Joshua Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Palmer, Robert)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7011938) of Tom Jacob by Plaintiffs Deborah Chong, N.R., Joshua Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Palmer, Robert)
July 16, 2019 Notice of Correction re: 4 and 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel filed Application for Admission to the Bar instead of a Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Please re-file your documents with a Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Documents 4 and 5 will be restricted. (srb)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by the Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons was sent to the named defendant via certified mail. (daf)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to USA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (kma)
July 11, 2019 Notice: If case is to be referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington. (kma)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7000320), filed by Joshua Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form) (Palmer, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts et al v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. R., Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Chong
Represented By: Tom Jacob
Represented By: Robert Gray Palmer
Represented By: Jamal Alsaffar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Roberts
Represented By: Robert Gray Palmer
Represented By: Tom Jacob
Represented By: Jamal Alsaffar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.R.
Represented By: Tom Jacob
Represented By: Robert Gray Palmer
Represented By: Jamal Alsaffar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?