Jennings v. Miami Valley Pizza, LLC d/b/a Pizza Hut et al
Plaintiff: HEATH JENNINGS
Defendant: MIAMI VALLEY PIZZA, LLC D/B/A PIZZA HUT, ROBERT W. MALONE and Miami Valley Pizza, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00204
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 9/20/2019. by Defendant Miami Valley Pizza, LLC. (McKenzie, John)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Miami Valley Pizza, LLC. (McKenzie, John)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John W McKenzie for Defendant Miami Valley Pizza, LLC (McKenzie, John)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Heath Jennings (Newport, Pamela)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Robert W. Malone, Miami Valley Pizza, LLC. (kma)
July 11, 2019 Notice: If case is to be referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington. (kma)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against ROBERT W. MALONE, MIAMI VALLEY PIZZA, LLC D/B/A PIZZA HUT ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7003101), filed by HEATH JENNINGS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CONSENT FORM, #2 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #3 Summons Form SUMMONS - BUSINESS, #4 Summons Form SUMMONS - INDIVIDUAL DEF) (Newport, Pamela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jennings v. Miami Valley Pizza, LLC d/b/a Pizza Hut et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIAMI VALLEY PIZZA, LLC D/B/A PIZZA HUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT W. MALONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami Valley Pizza, LLC
Represented By: John W McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEATH JENNINGS
Represented By: Pamela Marie Newport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?