White v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sharon White
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 3:2019cv00212
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael J Newman
Referring Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE: Plaintiff is hereby NOTIFIED of her duty under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) to complete service, including a summons signed and sealed by the clerk, on Defendants by October 15, 2019 (90 days after the filing of her complaint). The failure to do so may result in a dismissal of her action. (tg)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 8/6/2019. (dm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The following document(s) were not submitted to the Office of the Clerk: Summons and US Marshal Form 285) by Plaintiff Sharon White. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (srb)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Sharon White. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Mailing Envelope) (kma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?