Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company v. Dell Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Defendant: Simplo Technology Co. LTD, NEWEGG INC., Dell Inc and LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00223
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Ovington
Referring Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Case is referred to Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington. Settlement Demand due by 6/20/2020. Cut-off date for motions to amend the pleadings and to add parties: due by 1/31/2020. Cut-off date for motions directed to the pleadings (including motions to dismiss and motions for judgment on the pleadings):due by 1/31/2020. Date by which parties must identify lay witnesses and provide a synopsis of their testimony: due by 3/30/2020. Plaintiff Primary Expert due by 9/14/2020. Plaintiff Rebuttal Expert due by 12/7/2020. Defendant Primary Expert due by 11/30/2020. Defendant Rebuttal Expert due by 12/7/2020. Request for Admissions due by 12/7/2020. Discovery due by 12/17/2020. Status Conference set for 1/21/2021 10:00 AM by Teleconference before Judge Thomas M. Rose. Summary Judgment Motions Deadline by 1/29/2021. Courts target date for deciding summary judgment motions: 60 days prior to trial. Cut-off date for filing motions in limine with respect to trial testimony: 10 days prior to FPT. Cut-off date for filing the parties joint proposed final pretrial order: 10 days prior to FPT. Trial exhibits to be exchanged by: 3 days prior to FPT. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/15/2021 02:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Thomas M. Rose. Cut-off date for filing proposed jury instructions, proposed special verdicts or interrogatories, and a joint statement of the case (which must be consistent with the joint proposed final pretrial order): 1 week prior to trial. Transcripts of depositions with designations of testimony to be used: 14 days prior to trial. Cut-off date for filing counter designations in deposition transcripts: 7 days prior to trial. Exhibit List due by 8/4/2021. Bench Trial set for 8/9/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Dayton before Judge Thomas M. Rose. Law clerk assigned: Michael Mayer. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 12/18/2019. (srb)
December 18, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas M. Rose: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/17/2019. Scheduling Order to issue. (ep)
December 12, 2019 Filing 14 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Gordon, Brad)
November 7, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference is set for Tuesday, December 17, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Thomas M. Rose. Parties shall call 1-888-684-8852, enter access code 1916636, enter security code 12172019 and wait for the Court to join the conference.***Prior to the pretrial conference counsel must comply with the MANDATORY DISCLOSURE RULES of Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(1) and the MANDATORY, pre-preliminary pretrial conference between counsel, required by Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f). NOTE: the format for the Rule 26(f) conference between counsel and the report to the Court has been altered. This new form is available on line and MUST be utilized in this case. THE REPORT MUST BE FILED 7 DAYS PRIOR TO THE PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. In all cases with class action allegations, the parties shall include in their Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) report proposed deadlines for completing discovery relevant to those allegations and for filing a motion to certify a class, and a proposed date for class action determination. Pretrial procedures and forms can be found at our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov. (ep)
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Bickley, Maureen)
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Dell Inc. (Leithart, Paul)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brad M. Gordon. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 10/16/2019. (srb)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7155470) of Brad M. Gordon, Esq. by Plaintiff Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Wargo, Leslie)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO MOVE, ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD by Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Bickley, Maureen)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Newegg Inc., Hangzhou Liaison Interactive Information Technology Co., Ltd. identifying Other Affiliate Hangzhou Liaison Interactive Information Technology Co., Ltd. for Newegg Inc... (Goldberg, Stuart)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Move or Plead by Defendant Dell Inc. (Leithart, Paul)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants NEWEGG INC., Hangzhou Liaison Interactive Information Technology Co., Ltd. identifying Other Affiliate Hangzhou Liaison Interactive Information Technology Co., Ltd. for NEWEGG INC... (Goldberg, Stuart)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 Separate ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by NEWEGG INC.. (Goldberg, Stuart)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Dell Inc on 8/7/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Wargo, Leslie)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to NEWEGG INC. on 8/7/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Wargo, Leslie)
July 25, 2019 If case is referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington. (jmb)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Simplo Technology Co. LTD. (jmb)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Wargo, Leslie)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Dell Inc, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., NEWEGG INC., Simplo Technology Co. LTD ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7025857), filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company as subrogee of Tom Hart. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Summons-Simplo Technology Co. LTD., #3 Plaintiff's Notice of Issuing Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons on Certain Defendants) (Wargo, Leslie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company v. Dell Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simplo Technology Co. LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEWEGG INC.
Represented By: Stuart J Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell Inc
Represented By: Paul Walter Leithart, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Maureen Allison Bickley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Leslie Erin Wargo
Represented By: Brad M Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?