Ridout v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Bobby Alan Ridout
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv00236
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Ovington
Referring Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Susana Ochoa for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Ochoa, Susana) Modified attorney role and notification on 8/27/2019 (rp).
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (kma)
August 7, 2019 Case transferred in from Cincinnati Division on 08/07/2019 Case Number 1:19-cv-646. Case assigned to Judge Thomas M. Rose.. (cb)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - this case is hereby transferred from the docket of theHonorable Michael R. Barrett to the Office of the Clerk for reassignment to the Western Division of the Southern District of Ohio at Dayton. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 08/07/2019. (cb)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7051151), (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Williams, James) Modified on 8/8/2019 to clarify docket text(kma).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ridout v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Alan Ridout
Represented By: James Roy Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Susana Ochoa
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?