Hart Coleman v. Commissioner for Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Kathleen Hart Coleman
Defendant: Commissioner for Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv00364
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Ovington
Referring Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:425
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner for Social Security Administration. Commissioner for Social Security Administration served on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (srb)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 12/5/2019. (srb)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 JOINT CONSENT OF THE PARTIES TO PROCEED BEFORE THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE . (Ochoa, Susana)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Susana Ochoa for Defendant Commissioner for Social Security Administration (Ochoa, Susana) Modified attorney role and notification on 12/5/2019 (rp).
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner for Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (kma)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Commissioner for Social Security Administration, filed by Kathleen Hart Coleman. (kma)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 11/19/2019. (lk)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kathleen Hart Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form US Attorney Office, #4 Summons Form Office of Regional Chief Counsel, #5 Summons Form Attorney General, #6 Summons Form Commissioner of Social Security, #7 US Marshal) (Nicholson, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hart Coleman v. Commissioner for Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Hart Coleman
Represented By: John T Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner for Social Security Administration
Represented By: Susana Ochoa
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?