United States of America; Southern District of Ohio v. Carrillo
Plaintiff: United States of America; Southern District of Ohio
Defendant: Javier H Carrillo
Case Number: 3:2020cv00082
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael J Newman
Referring Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER - Due to the corona virus pandemic, and with the agreement of counsel for the United States, (the movant), the Show Cause hearing previously scheduled for April 10, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. is CANCELLED. The hearing is continued until a new date and time is requested by the United States. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 4/2/2020. (dm)
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Proof of Service Acknowledgment filed by Plaintiff United States of America; Southern District of Ohio. (Downey, Michael)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Hearing set for 4/10/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Dayton before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 3/6/2020. (dm)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons , filed by United States of America; Southern District of Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration Ex. C, #2 Exhibit Declaration Ex. D, #3 Summons Form Ex. A, #4 Summons Form Ex. B, #5 Supplement, #6 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Downey, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America; Southern District of Ohio v. Carrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America; Southern District of Ohio
Represented By: Michael John Thomas Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javier H Carrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?