Dukes et al v. McClay Transportation USA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Megan Dukes and HEATH JENNINGS
Defendant: McClay Transportation USA, LLC, Todd Bowling and Todd A. Bowling
Case Number: 3:2020cv00144
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Douglas R Cole
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Defendants' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael T. Franz. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 6/2/20. (sct)
May 28, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7484377) of Michael T. Franz by Defendants Todd A. Bowling, McClay Transportation USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Michael T. Franz, #2 Exhibit 2 - Attorney Registration and Disciplinary Commission (Franz), #3 Exhibit 3 - Certificate of Good Standing (Franz)) (Gray, Todd)
May 28, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Todd A. Bowling, McClay Transportation USA, LLC. (Gray, Todd)
May 28, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Todd A. Bowling, McClay Transportation USA, LLC. (Gray, Todd)
May 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Allen Gray for Defendants Todd A. Bowling, McClay Transportation USA, LLC (Gray, Todd)
May 14, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Todd A. Bowling on 4/15/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Leizerman, Michael)
May 14, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to McClay Transportation USA, LLC on 4/15/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Leizerman, Michael)
May 14, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Todd A. Bowling, McClay Transportation USA, LLC. (kma)
May 13, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Todd Bowling (Leizerman, Michael)
May 13, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. McClay Transportation USA, LLC (Leizerman, Michael)
April 17, 2020 ...If this case is referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman... (srb)
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Megan Dukes, HEATH JENNINGS re #1 Complaint, of Civil Cover Sheet (Leizerman, Michael)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7424997), filed by Megan Dukes, HEATH JENNINGS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Entry Appointing Fiduciary and Letters of Authority) (Leizerman, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dukes et al v. McClay Transportation USA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McClay Transportation USA, LLC
Represented By: Todd Allen Gray
Represented By: Michael T. Franz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Bowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd A. Bowling
Represented By: Todd Allen Gray
Represented By: Michael T. Franz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Dukes
Represented By: Michael Leizerman
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Snead
Represented By: Rena M. Leizerman
Represented By: James M Thorson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEATH JENNINGS
Represented By: Michael Leizerman
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Snead
Represented By: Rena M. Leizerman
Represented By: James M Thorson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?