Schoenfeld v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00159
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Filing 14 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint filed by Mercedes Benz USA LLC. (Meyer, Michael)
June 2, 2020 Filing 13 DECISION AND ENTRY OVERRULING AS MOOT DEFENDANT MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 6/2/20. (pb)
June 1, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held: Telephone Conference held on 5/29/2020, (Jury Trial set for 7/19/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Dayton before Judge Walter H. Rice, Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2021 05:00 PM in Teleconference before Judge Walter H. Rice.). Scheduling Order to be filed. (tp)
May 29, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Christopher Schoenfeld. (Steuart, Scarlett)
May 29, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mercedes Benz USA LLC, filed by Christopher Schoenfeld. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit Warranty) (Steuart, Scarlett)
May 21, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Mercedes Benz USA LLC. (Meyer, Michael)
May 21, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Christopher Schoenfeld. (Steuart, Scarlett)
May 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Scarlett Marie Steuart for Plaintiff Christopher Schoenfeld (Steuart, Scarlett)
May 4, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Mercedes Benz USA LLC answer due 5/21/2020. (kma)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER sustaining #7 MOTION for Extension of Time by Defendant Mercedes Benz USA LLC.New date requested 5/21/2020. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 05/01/2020. (tp)
April 29, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 5/21/2020. by Defendant Mercedes Benz USA LLC. (Meyer, Michael)
April 27, 2020 Filing 6 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Scarlett M. Steuart (kma)
April 27, 2020 Filing 5 (Copy of)COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND originally filed in Montgomery County Common Pleas Court on March 24, 2020, under case number 2020 CV01497. (kma)
April 27, 2020 Filing 3 Notice: If case is to be referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington. (kma)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Mercedes Benz USA LLC, Daimler AG identifying Corporate Parent Daimler AG for Mercedes Benz USA LLC.. (Meyer, Michael)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Common Pleas Court of Montgomery County, Ohio, case number 2020 CV 01497 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7436675), filed by Mercedes Benz USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Case Information Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Meyer, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schoenfeld v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?