United States Of America v. Hines et al
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Defendant: Kathleen M Hines and Robert M Hines
Case Number: 3:2020cv00229
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2020 Filing 5 DEFENDANT, KATHLEEN M. HINES, ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Kathleen M Hines. (Hines, Dean)
July 3, 2020 Filing 4 DEFENDANT, ROBERT M. HINES DBA: HINES HOME IMPROVEMENT ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Robert M Hines. (Hines, Dean)
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Kathleen M Hines on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Stallings, Mary)
June 22, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Robert M Hines on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Stallings, Mary)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Stallings, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America v. Hines et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen M Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: Mary A. Stallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?