Village of Camden, Ohio v. Cargill, Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Village of Camden, Ohio
Defendant: R. Good Rentals, LLC, Cargill, Incorporated, Good Rail & Truck Transfer, Inc., Central Salt and R. Good Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00273
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Douglas R Cole
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Reply of Defendants Cargill and Central Salt in Support of their Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Village of Camden, Ohio. (Haughey, Stephen)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #14 Defendant Central Salt's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer Hannah. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 8/12/20. (sct)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #11 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Danielle List. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 8/12/20. (sct)
August 11, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Central Salt and Cargill, Incorporated filed by Defendant Cargill, Incorporated. (Van Kley, Jack)
August 7, 2020 Filing 16 Filing fee: $ 200.00, receipt number 100CIN039943 re #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer Hannah. (eh)
August 7, 2020 Filing 15 Filing fee: Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Danielle List re #11 . $ 200.00, receipt number 300DAY024057. (kma) Modified on 8/11/2020 to add PHV Counsel name (srb).
August 6, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ($200.00 Filing Fee, Receipt No. 100CIN039943) of Jennifer Hannah by Defendant Central Salt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Shadley, Frederic) Modified docket text on 8/7/2020 (eh).
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 and #10 Defendant Cargill, Incorporated's Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jacob Bylund and Julian Harrell. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 8/3/20. (sct)
July 28, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Central Salt and Cargill Incorporated filed by Plaintiff Village of Camden, Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit One, #2 Exhibit Two, #3 Exhibit Three, #4 Exhibit Four) (Haughey, Stephen)
July 28, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Danielle List by Plaintiff Village of Camden, Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Danielle List) (Haughey, Stephen)
July 16, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7558767) of Julian E. Harrell by Defendant Cargill, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Van Kley, Jack)
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7558617) of Jacob D. Bylund by Defendant Cargill, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Van Kley, Jack)
July 8, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #2 Complaint filed by Good Rail & Truck Transfer, Inc., R. Good Enterprises, LLC. (Rafferty, Donald)
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Defendant R. Good Rentals, LLC. (Rich, Matthew)
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant R. Good Rentals, LLC ANSWER to #2 Complaint filed by R. Good Rentals, LLC. (Rich, Matthew)
July 7, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Central Salt and by Defendant Cargill, Incorporated. (Van Kley, Jack)
July 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Defendant Cargill, Incorporated re #2 Complaint of Filing Exhibits for Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Summary Judgement Entry of July 29, 2020, #2 Exhibit B, Contract between Cargill and Good Rail, #3 Exhibit C, Contract between Central Salt and Good Enterprises, #4 Exhibit D, Judgment Entry of Feb. 27, 2020, #5 Exhibit E, Judgment Entry of Jan. 23, 2020, #6 Exhibit F, Scheduling Entry of Feb. 24, 2020) (Van Kley, Jack)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Danielle E. List. (kma)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 (Copy of) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND originally filed in Preble County Common Pleas Court on June 3, 2020, under case number 20CV032007. (kma)
July 2, 2020 Notice: If case is to be referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington. (kma)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Preble County Court of Common Pleas, case number 20CV032007, filed by Cargill, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, Prior State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit C, Voluntary Dismissal, #4 Exhibit D, Auditor's Property Card, #5 Exhibit E, Tami Good Voter Registration, #6 Exhibit F, Good Enterprises Dissolution, #7 Exhibit G, Rod Good Voter Registration, #8 Exhibit H, Good Rail Dissolution, #9 Exhibit I, Consent to Removal, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Van Kley, Jack) Receipt Number 0648-7536016.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Village of Camden, Ohio v. Cargill, Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Good Rentals, LLC
Represented By: Matthew A Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill, Incorporated
Represented By: Jack Allen Van Kley
Represented By: Jacob D. Bylund
Represented By: Julian E. Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good Rail & Truck Transfer, Inc.
Represented By: Donald John Rafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Salt
Represented By: Jennifer M Hannah
Represented By: Frederic X Shadley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Good Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Donald John Rafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Camden, Ohio
Represented By: Stephen Neal Haughey
Represented By: Danielle List
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?