Bowen v. Dobbins
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Bowen
Defendant: Dwight David Combs
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Dwight Dobbins
Case Number: 3:2020cv00292
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Douglas R Cole
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Dwight David Combs as to Third Party Complaint. (kma)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay re #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #8 Third Party Complaint by Defendant Dwight Dobbins. (Lagos, Argeri)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Dwight David Combs, filed by Dwight Dobbins. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form) (Lagos, Argeri)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Elizabeth Bowen filed by Dwight Dobbins. (Lagos, Argeri)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #6 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint. Dwight Dobbins response due 8/31/20. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 8/5/20. (sct)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #1 Complaint New date requested 8/31/2020. by Defendant Dwight Dobbins. (Lagos, Argeri) Modified docket text on 8/5/2020 (sct).
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Argeri Atharasios Lagos for Defendant Dwight Dobbins (Lagos, Argeri)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Dwight Dobbins. Dwight Dobbins served on 7/18/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt Green Card Return, #2 Summons Form) (Henry, R.)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dwight Dobbins. (kma)
July 16, 2020 Notice: If case is to be referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington. (kma)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Henry, R.)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Wrongful Denial of ERISA Benefits against Dwight Dobbins ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7556335), filed by Elizabeth Bowen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Henry, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowen v. Dobbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Dwight Dobbins
Represented By: Argeri Atharasios Lagos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Bowen
Represented By: R. Mark Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight David Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?